Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 09/18/1985
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 10/23/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/22/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 04/24/1986
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/05/1986