Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/18/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 09/18/1985
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 09/18/1985
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 09/18/1985
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/23/1985
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/23/1985
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 09/23/1985
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/23/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/23/1985
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 09/30/1985
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 09/30/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/30/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 09/30/1985
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 09/30/1985
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 09/30/1985
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 09/30/1985
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 09/30/1985
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/30/1985
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 10/03/1985
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 10/03/1985
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/03/1985
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/03/1985
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 10/03/1985
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/03/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 10/03/1985
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 10/10/1985
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/10/1985