Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/31/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 11/05/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/03/1985
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/03/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 12/13/1985
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/29/1986
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/19/1986