Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/13/1985
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/05/1986
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/05/1986
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/06/1986
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 02/07/1986
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/24/1986
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/24/1986
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/27/1986
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/04/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/07/1986

Show cosponsors who withdrew