Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 12/02/1985
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 12/06/1985
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 12/06/1985
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 12/11/1985
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 12/11/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 12/12/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/12/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 12/12/1985
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 12/13/1985
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 12/13/1985
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 12/20/1985
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 12/20/1985
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 12/20/1985
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 12/20/1985
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 01/21/1986
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/21/1986
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 01/21/1986
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/18/1986
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/19/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/24/1986
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 02/24/1986
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/24/1986
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/27/1986
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/27/1986