Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Targeted Fiscal Assistance Act of 1986

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to create a fiscal safety net program for needy communities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/1986Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
07/24/1986Subcommittee on Intergovernmental Relations. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Intergovernmental Relations
02/10/1986Referred to Subcommittee on Intergovernmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
01/30/1986Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA]* 01/30/1986
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 02/25/1986
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/07/1986
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 09/08/1986

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs01/30/1986 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Intergovernmental Relations02/10/1986 Referred to
07/24/1986 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2037. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/30/1986)

Targeted Fiscal Assistance Act of 1986 - Amends Federal law to replace the general revenue sharing program with the Targeted Fiscal Assistance (TFA) program. Authorizes appropriations for TFA for FY 1987 through 1989.

Provides for special allocations of TFA funds for Indian tribes, Alaskan native villages, and the District of Columbia.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to allocate TFA funds to each State (for subsequent allocation to local governments) according to a specified formula based on the need factor, the general tax effort factor, and the relative fiscal gap factor, as defined in this Act, for each State. Entitles local governments to a portion of such State funds according to a specified formula based on the following factors, as defined in this Act, for each unit of local government in a State relative to all units in such State: (1) the unit's population; (2) the unit's general tax effort factor; and (3) the unit's relative income factor. Eliminates provisions allowing State variation of local government allocations. Sets forth maximum and minimum limitations on local government entitlements.