Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/21/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/21/1986
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/02/1986
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 06/10/1986
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 06/19/1986
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/19/1986
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/23/1986
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/14/1986
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 07/14/1986
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/15/1986
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 07/15/1986
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/22/1986
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/23/1986
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 08/06/1986
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 08/06/1986
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/08/1986
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/08/1986
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/16/1986
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/17/1986
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/19/1986
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 09/24/1986
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/29/1986
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/29/1986
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/02/1986
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/09/1986
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 10/09/1986