Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 07/17/1986
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/04/1986
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 08/04/1986
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 08/04/1986
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/15/1986
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 08/15/1986
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 08/15/1986
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/19/1986
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/25/1986
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/25/1986
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/25/1986
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/07/1986
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 10/07/1986
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/17/1986