Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Air Carrier Access Act of 1986

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Air Carrier Access Act of 1986

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Aviation Act of 1958 to provide that prohibition of discrimination against handicapped individuals shall apply to air carriers.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/02/1986Became Public Law No: 99-435.
10/02/1986Signed by President.
09/24/1986Presented to President.
09/18/1986Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/18/1986House Committee on Public Works and Transportation Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/15/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/13/1986Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Danforth without amendment. With written report No. 99-400.
07/30/1986Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/02/1986Became Public Law No: 99-435.
10/02/1986Signed by President.
09/24/1986SenatePresented to President.
09/23/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/18/1986HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
09/18/1986HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/1986HouseHouse Committee on Public Works and Transportation Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/08/1986HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
08/15/1986SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/13/1986SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 837.
08/13/1986SenateCommittee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Danforth without amendment. With written report No. 99-400.
08/07/1986SenateCommittee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/30/1986SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/30/1986 Referred to
08/07/1986 Markup by
08/13/1986 Reported by S.Rept 99-400
House Public Works and Transportation09/08/1986 Referred to
09/18/1986 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2703. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/30/1986)

Air Carrier Access Act of 1986 - Amends the Federal Aviation Act of 1958 to prohibit air carriers from discriminating against handicapped persons.

Directs the Secretary of Transportation to promulgate regulations to ensure non-discriminatory treatment of such persons.