Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original bill relating to telephone services for Senators.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/02/1986Became Public Law No: 99-439.
10/02/1986Signed by President.
09/24/1986Presented to President.
09/18/1986Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/18/1986House Committee on House Administration Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/16/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/14/1986Committee on Rules. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Mathias. With written report No. 99-404.
08/14/1986Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/02/1986Became Public Law No: 99-439.
10/02/1986Signed by President.
09/24/1986SenatePresented to President.
09/23/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/18/1986HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
09/18/1986HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/1986HouseHouse Committee on House Administration Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/17/1986HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
09/17/1986HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
09/08/1986HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
08/16/1986SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/14/1986SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 852.
08/14/1986SenateCommittee on Rules. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Mathias. With written report No. 99-404.
08/12/1986SenateCommittee on Rules ordered to be reported an original measure.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration09/08/1986 Referred to
09/17/1986 Markup by
09/18/1986 Discharged from
Senate Rules and Administration08/12/1986 Markup by
08/14/1986 Reported original measure S.Rept 99-404

No related bill information was received for S.2759.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2759. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/14/1986)

Amends the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 1984 to remove the restrictions which prohibited furnishing Senators' State offices with telecommunications services for which a charge is based on the amount of time the service is used.