Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 08/15/1986
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/09/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/10/1986
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 09/11/1986
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/11/1986
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 09/12/1986
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/12/1986
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/15/1986
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 09/15/1986
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/17/1986
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/17/1986
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/17/1986
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/17/1986
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/17/1986
Sen. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC] 09/18/1986
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/18/1986
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/18/1986
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 09/19/1986
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/23/1986
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/23/1986
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/23/1986
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/23/1986
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/23/1986
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/25/1986
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 09/25/1986
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 09/26/1986
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/26/1986
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 09/26/1986
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 09/30/1986
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/08/1986

Show cosponsors who withdrew