Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/31/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/31/1985
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 02/05/1985
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/05/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/05/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/19/1985
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/19/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 02/19/1985
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/19/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 03/07/1985
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/07/1985
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/07/1985
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/26/1985
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/27/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 07/19/1985