Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/06/1985
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 02/06/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/19/1985
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/20/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/25/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/26/1985
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/27/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/05/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/18/1985
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/18/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/19/1985
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 03/26/1985
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/26/1985
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/26/1985
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/02/1985
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/02/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/15/1985
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 04/15/1985
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/17/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 04/18/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 04/22/1985
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/22/1985
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/23/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/24/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/24/1985
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 04/25/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/25/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/30/1985
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 05/15/1985
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/06/1985