Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to recognize the organization known as The Statue of Liberty-Ellis Island Foundation, Inc.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/08/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/20/1985Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-88.
02/21/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
07/11/1985HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/10/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
07/08/1985SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/20/1985SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 191.
06/20/1985SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 99-88.
05/02/1985SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/03/1985SenateCommittee on Judiciary received executive comment from Interior Department.
03/28/1985SenateCommittee on Judiciary received executive comment from Commerce Department (Patent and Trademark Office).
02/25/1985SenateCommittee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Interior Department, Commerce Department (Patent and Trademark Office).
02/21/1985SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/21/1985
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/21/1985
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 02/21/1985
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/22/1985
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/22/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/27/1985
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/27/1985
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/27/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/05/1985
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/07/1985
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/07/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/14/1985
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 03/14/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 03/19/1985

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/21/1985 Referred to
05/02/1985 Markup by
06/20/1985 Reported by S.Rept 99-88
House Judiciary07/10/1985 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations07/11/1985 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.487.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.487. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/08/1985)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Grants a Federal charter to the Statue of Liberty-Ellis Island Foundation, Inc.