Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/07/1985
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/26/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/15/1985
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/26/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/19/1985