Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 03/14/1985
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/16/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/16/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/16/1985
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 05/20/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/17/1985
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/17/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/17/1985
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/20/1985
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/25/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/26/1985
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/17/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 09/20/1985
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 09/20/1985
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/16/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 10/16/1985
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/16/1985
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 10/22/1985
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/22/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 10/22/1985
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/29/1985
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/07/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/22/1985
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 11/22/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 12/09/1985
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/04/1986
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/04/1986
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/27/1986
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/20/1986
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/20/1986
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/09/1986
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 05/07/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/08/1986
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/23/1986
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 07/30/1986
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/08/1986
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/19/1986