Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Emergency Wetlands Resources Act of 1986

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Emergency Wetlands Resources Act of 1986

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Wetlands Resources Act of 1985

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to promote the conservation of migratory waterfowl and to offset or prevent the serious loss of wetlands by the acquistion of wetlands and other essential habitat, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend until October 1, 1995, the authority for appropriations to promote the conservation of migratory waterfowl and to offset or prevent the serious loss of wetlands and other essential habitat, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/10/1986Became Public Law No: 99-645.
11/10/1986Signed by President.
10/30/1986Presented to President.
10/14/1986Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
09/25/1986Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure without amendment. Without written report.
09/16/1986Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-445.
03/26/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/10/1986Became Public Law No: 99-645.
11/10/1986Signed by President.
10/30/1986SenatePresented to President.
10/29/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/14/1986HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/14/1986HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
10/03/1986SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986SenateCommittee substitute, as amended, agreed to by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/03/1986SenateS.Amdt.3220 Amendment SP 3220 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986SenateS.Amdt.3222 Amendment SP 3222 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986SenateS.Amdt.3221 Amendment SP 3221 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986SenateS.Amdt.3220 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Chafee. To establish the Bayou Savauge Urban National Wildlife Refuge in the State of Louisiana.
10/03/1986SenateS.Amdt.3222 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator McClure. Of a technical and clarifying nature.
10/03/1986SenateS.Amdt.3221 Proposed by Senator Stevens. To amend S. 740, the Emergency Wetlands Resources Act of 1986.
09/25/1986SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 994.
09/25/1986SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure without amendment. Without written report.
09/24/1986SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/23/1986SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
09/16/1986SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
09/16/1986SenateReferred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources pursuant to the order of May 20, 1986.
09/16/1986SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-445.
08/12/1986SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/20/1986SenateOrdered, that when reported, the bill be referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources for a period not to exceed 60 calendar days.
11/18/1985SenateSubcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-379.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution
03/26/1985SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 03/26/1985
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/26/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 03/26/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/26/1985

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/26/1985 Referred to
08/12/1986 Markup by
09/16/1986 Reported by S.Rept 99-445
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution11/18/1985 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/16/1986 Referred to
09/24/1986 Markup by
09/25/1986 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Reserved Water and Resource Conservation09/16/1986 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.740.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.740. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/03/1986)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Emergency Wetlands Resources Act of 1986 - Title I: Extension of Wetlands Loan Act - Extends the authorization of the Wetlands Loan Act through FY 1988.

Title II: Revenues for Refuge Operations and the Migratory Bird Conservation Fund - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to charge fees for admission permits to designated units of the National Wildlife Refuge System. Authorizes entry without a permit for certain limited purposes. Authorizes the Secretary to sell, at designated units, Golden Eagle Passports. Directs the Secretary to treat the revenues accruing from such sales in the same manner as fees collected for admission permits. Describes the kinds of admission permits which may be purchased, including individual, group and special free permits for the blind or disabled. Exempts specified refuges in Alaska created or modified by the Alaska Lands Conservation Act. Requires the deposit of 70 percent of such fees into the Migratory Bird Conservation Fund, the remaining 30 percent to go towards the operation and maintenance of the collecting unit and the System as a whole.

Increases the price of the migratory bird hunting and conservation stamp.

Requires that the amount of import duties collected on arms and ammunition be paid into the migratory bird conservation fund.

Title III: State and Federal Wetland Acquisition - Directs the Secretary to establish and periodically revise a national wetlands priority conservation plan which establishes priorities for Federal and State acquisition of wetlands on a region-by-region basis. Requires the Secretary to consider the proportion of remaining wetlands to pre-European colonization levels, the rate of loss, and the contribution of such wetlands to natural resource values.

Amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to remove certain restrictions on the acquisition of such lands. Requires each comprehensive statewide outdoor recreation plan under such Act to specifically address wetlands as an important recreation resource.

Authorizes the Secretary to acquire wetlands not acquired under the authority of the Migratory Bird Conservation Act of 1929.

Restricts the use of eminent domain in acquiring lands under this Act.

Title IV: Wetlands Inventory and Trend Analysis - Directs the Secretary, acting through the Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, to: (1) produce final National Wetlands Inventory maps for the entire United States (specifies dates at which different maps are to be completed); and (2) produce, by the end of FY 1990, and at ten year intervals thereafter, reports to update and improve the information contained in the report dated September 1982 and entitled "Status and Trends of Wetlands and Deepwater Habitat in the Coterminous United States, 1950's to 1970's."

Directs the Secretary, by March 30, 1987, for the lower Mississippi alluvial plain and the prairie pothole regions, and by the end of FY 1987 for other areas wetlands, to prepare and submit to specified congressional committees a report regarding wetlands losses in the United States.

Title V: Miscellaneous Provisions - Amends the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to require violations of such Act to be knowing before penalties apply.

Establishes the Bayou Sauvage Urban National Wildlife Refuge, Louisiana. Authorizes appropriations.