Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Biomass Energy and Alcohol Fuels Act of 1980 to clarify the intention of Section 221 of the Act.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/16/1985Became Public Law No: 99-24.
04/16/1985Signed by President.
04/04/1985Presented to President.
04/02/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
04/02/1985House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/28/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/28/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
04/16/1985Became Public Law No: 99-24.
04/16/1985Signed by President.
04/04/1985SenatePresented to President.
04/04/1985SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
04/02/1985HousePassed House by Unanimous Consent.
04/02/1985HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
04/02/1985HouseHouse Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/01/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
03/28/1985SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/28/1985
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 03/28/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/28/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 03/28/1985

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs04/01/1985 Referred to
04/02/1985 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.781.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.781. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/28/1985)

Amends the Biomass Energy and Alcohol Fuels Act of 1980 to extend through September 30, 1985, all conditional commitments for loan guarantees which were in existence on September 30, 1984.