Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/18/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/18/1985
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 02/03/1986
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/26/1986
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/12/1986
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/18/1986
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/21/1986
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/06/1986
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 05/06/1986
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/06/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/26/1986