Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/05/1986
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/05/1986
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/06/1986
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/06/1986
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/18/1986
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 02/18/1986
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/04/1986
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/04/1986
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/04/1986
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/04/1986
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/04/1986
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/04/1986
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/04/1986
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/04/1986
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/04/1986
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/04/1986
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/04/1986
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA] 03/06/1986
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 03/06/1986
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/07/1986
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/11/1986