Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV]* 06/26/1986
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/26/1986
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 06/26/1986
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/14/1986
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/14/1986
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/14/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/15/1986
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 07/22/1986
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/22/1986
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/22/1986
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/24/1986
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/24/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/24/1986
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 08/04/1986
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 08/04/1986
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 08/06/1986
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 08/14/1986
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/08/1986
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/17/1986