Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/23/1986
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 09/23/1986
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/24/1986
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/25/1986
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/25/1986
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/25/1986
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 09/25/1986
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/30/1986
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/07/1986
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/16/1986