Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution to commemorate the accomplishments of Public Law 94-142, The Education for All Handicapped Children Act on the 10th anniversary of its enactment.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/29/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
10/21/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/16/1985Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
09/25/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
10/29/1985HouseHouse Incorporated H.Con.Res.201 in This Measure as an Amendment.
10/29/1985HouseResolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
10/29/1985HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
10/21/1985SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
10/16/1985SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.
10/16/1985SenateCommittee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
10/10/1985SenateCommittee on Labor and Human Resources. Approved for reporting without amendment favorably.
09/25/1985SenateReferred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/25/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 10/01/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 10/01/1985
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 10/01/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 10/01/1985
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/01/1985
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 10/01/1985
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/01/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/01/1985
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/01/1985
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 10/01/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/01/1985
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/01/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/01/1985
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA] 10/01/1985
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 10/01/1985
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/01/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/01/1985
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 10/01/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 10/01/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 10/01/1985
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/01/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/01/1985
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/01/1985
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/01/1985
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 10/01/1985
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 10/01/1985
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/01/1985
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/01/1985
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/01/1985
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 10/01/1985
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 10/01/1985
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/02/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 10/02/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/02/1985
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/02/1985
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/02/1985
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/02/1985
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/02/1985
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 10/02/1985
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/02/1985
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/02/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 10/08/1985
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/08/1985
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 10/08/1985
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/08/1985
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 10/16/1985
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/16/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/16/1985
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/16/1985
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/16/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 10/16/1985
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/21/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/21/1985
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/22/1985
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 10/22/1985
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 10/22/1985

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Labor and Human Resources09/25/1985 Referred to
10/10/1985 Markup by
10/16/1985 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.71. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/25/1985)

Commemorates the accomplishments of The Education of All Handicapped Children Act on its tenth anniversary.