Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 07/11/1985
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/11/1985
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA]* 07/11/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/24/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/24/1985
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/24/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/24/1985
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/24/1985
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/24/1985
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 07/24/1985
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/24/1985
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/24/1985
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 07/24/1985
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 07/24/1985
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 07/24/1985
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/24/1985
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/24/1985
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/24/1985
Sen. Evans, Daniel J. [R-WA] 07/24/1985
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/24/1985
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 07/24/1985
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 07/24/1985
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/24/1985
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 07/24/1985
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 07/30/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/30/1985
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/30/1985
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/30/1985
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/30/1985
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/30/1985
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/30/1985
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/30/1985
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/30/1985
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/30/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/30/1985
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/30/1985
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/30/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/30/1985
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/30/1985
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/30/1985
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/30/1985
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/30/1985
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 07/30/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/30/1985
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/30/1985
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/30/1985
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/31/1985
Sen. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA] 07/31/1985
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/31/1985
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/31/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 07/31/1985
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 09/12/1985
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/16/1985
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/16/1985