Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the week of April 20, 1986 as "Crime Victims Week".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/21/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/20/1986Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/18/1986Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/28/1986HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/25/1986HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/21/1986SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/20/1986SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569.
03/20/1986SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/20/1986SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/18/1986SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/18/1986 Referred to
03/20/1986 Markup by
03/20/1986 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service03/25/1986 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/28/1986 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.297. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/18/1986)

Designates the week of April 20, 1986, as Crime Victims Week.