Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate the week beginning May 18, 1986, as "National Digestive Diseases Awareness Week".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
05/19/1986Became Public Law No: 99-306.
05/19/1986Signed by President.
05/09/1986Presented to President.
05/07/1986Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
05/07/1986House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/22/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
04/17/1986Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
04/15/1986Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/19/1986Became Public Law No: 99-306.
05/19/1986Signed by President.
05/09/1986SenatePresented to President.
05/09/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
05/07/1986HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
05/07/1986HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
05/07/1986HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/24/1986HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
04/22/1986SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
04/17/1986SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
04/17/1986SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
04/17/1986SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/15/1986SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/15/1986 Referred to
04/17/1986 Markup by
04/17/1986 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service04/24/1986 Referred to
05/07/1986 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/15/1986)

Designates the week beginning May 18, 1986, as National Digestive Diseases Awareness Week.