Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution commemorating the Fiftieth Anniversary of the Rural Electrification Administration.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/04/1985Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment. Without written report.
04/29/1985Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
07/26/1985Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/04/1985Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 165.
06/04/1985Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment. Without written report.
06/04/1985Committee on Agriculture. Approved for reporting without amendment favorably.
05/21/1985Referred to Subcommittee on Agricultural Credit.
04/29/1985Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 04/29/1985
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/02/1985
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 05/06/1985
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/06/1985
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/07/1985
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 05/07/1985
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 05/07/1985
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 05/07/1985
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/07/1985
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 05/07/1985
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/07/1985
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 05/07/1985
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 05/07/1985
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/07/1985
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/07/1985
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/07/1985
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/07/1985
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/07/1985
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/07/1985
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/07/1985
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 05/07/1985
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/07/1985
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 05/09/1985
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 05/09/1985
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/09/1985
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/09/1985
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/09/1985
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/09/1985
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/09/1985
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 05/14/1985
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/14/1985
Sen. Hecht, Chic [R-NV] 05/14/1985
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/14/1985
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 05/14/1985
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/14/1985
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/14/1985
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/14/1985
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/15/1985
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/16/1985
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 05/17/1985
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/17/1985
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 05/17/1985
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 05/21/1985
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/21/1985
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/21/1985
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/21/1985
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/23/1985
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/23/1985
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 05/23/1985
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 06/07/1985

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry04/29/1985 Referred to
06/04/1985 Markup by
06/04/1985 Reported by
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Agricultural Credit and Rural Electrification05/21/1985 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Res.148.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.148. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/29/1985)

Commends the Rural Electrification Administration and dedicated individuals for their contributions to the progress made by the Nation during the past 50 years in achieving the electrification of rural America.